This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/12/2019 at 08:12:53 (UTC).

CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF EMERSON NEHER DECEASED, et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF EMERSON NEHER DECEASED. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

C/O Rabin Parker, P.A. 28059 Us Hwy 19 N, Ste. 301

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendants

NEHER, DON ALSO KNOWN AS NEHER, DONALD

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

UNKNOWN TENANTS

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF EMERSON NEHER DECEASED

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENNETT L RABIN

Attorney at RABIN PARKER PA

28059 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 301

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY ALLEN FOX

Attorney at FOX AND FOX P A

2515 Countryside Blvd Ste G

Clearwater, FL 33763

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

01/07/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/07/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/07/2019: EXHIBIT

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

12/20/2018: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF DROPPING

12/19/2018: NOTICE OF DROPPING

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/27/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

EX-PARTE MOTION

11/20/2018: EX-PARTE MOTION

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/13/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/13/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

EXHIBIT

01/07/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/07/2019: EXHIBIT

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

12/31/2018: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

ORDER

11/27/2018: ORDER

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/07/2019: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVER

11/27/2018: NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVER

NOTICE OF ACTION

11/27/2018: NOTICE OF ACTION

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/13/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

11/13/2018: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Doc # 33; **ESF PAID** AND FOR AWARD OF ATTY'S FEES/COSTS; Party: CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 34; A- ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 35; B- COPY CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 36; C- AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 37; D- AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTN FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTYS' FEES/COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 38; E- AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY'S TIME/PARALEGALS' TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 39; F- AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 40; G- AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTY'S AND PARALEGAL'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 41; H- CALCULATION WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 32; Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC OF EMERSON NEHER DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 11; NOTICE OF INTENT TO LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 12; AMENDED CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 13; REGULAR U.S. MAIL AND RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 14; SECOND NOTICE RE: 9790 66TH STREET NORTH 395

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 15; ISSUED; Party: NEHER, DON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 16; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 378.00; Total Payments and Credits; 378.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00798; CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 378.00; Total Payments and Credits; 378.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 378.00; Total Payments and Credits; 378.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-41731; CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; (329.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER CASCADE HOWEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Total Financial Assessment; 378.00; Total Payments and Credits; 378.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 329.00

    Read MoreRead Less