This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:05:03 (UTC).

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG Vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC PATRICIA A WALKER DECEASED, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CITY OF ST PETERSBURG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC PATRICIA A WALKER DECEASED. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MINKOFF, THOMAS H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

St Petersburg, FL 33701

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendants

WALKER SR, TYRONE C, SR

WALKER, BENERLY JEAN

WALKER JR, TYRONE C, JR

WALKER, PATRICIA A

WALKER, BENERLY JEAN ALSO KNOWN AS WALKER GARCIA, BEVERLY J

WALKER, PATRICIA A ALSO KNOWN AS WALKER-EDWARDS, PATRICIA ALSO KNOWN AS WALKER-KENDRICK, PATRICIA

MOORE, MELODY

DAVIS, DONNA

BANKS, URSULA

WALKER, BEVERLY JEAN ALSO KNOWN AS WALKER GARCIA, BEVERLY J

UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC PATRICIA A WALKER DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW D WEIDNER, ESQ

Attorney at WEIDNER LAW P A

250 Mirror Lake Dr North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorney

JAY D PASSER, ESQ

Attorney at JAY D PASSER P A

4100 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 322

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/08/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/09/2020: REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN-ADMINISTRATOR-ATTORNEY A

01/14/2020: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN-ADMINISTRATOR-ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/15/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EXHIBIT

01/09/2020: EXHIBIT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/09/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION

01/10/2020: MOTION

COPY

01/15/2020: COPY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/27/2020: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/09/2020: REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/09/2020: REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF; Doc # 26; Party: PASSER, JAY D, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 24; Party: WALKER, BEVERLY JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 22; RETURN OF SERVICE/SUMMONS FOR BEVERLY JEAN WALKER; Party: WALKER, BEVERLY JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 23; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN-ADMINISTRATOR-ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Doc # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 500.50; Total Payments and Credits; 500.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-01047; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; (52.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 500.50; Total Payments and Credits; 500.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 52.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 14; FOR APPOINTMENT OF ADMINISTRATOR ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Filed by: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 13; Party: WALKER JR, TYRONE C, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 500.50; Total Payments and Credits; 500.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46054; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; (448.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 500.50; Total Payments and Credits; 500.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 448.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: WALKER SR, TYRONE C, SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: WALKER, PATRICIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: WALKER, BEVERLY JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: WALKER JR, TYRONE C, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (R); Doc # 6; Vol./Book 20805, Page 401, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 8; A - CITY OF ST PETERSBURG FINAL ASSESSMENT ROLL

    Read MoreRead Less