This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/26/2022 at 08:14:50 (UTC).

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT Vs. LEANDER TYRONE HUEWITT, et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against LEANDER TYRONE HUEWITT,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RONDOLINO, ANTHONY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendants

BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORP

P O Box 2997

Phoenix, AZ 85062

HUEWITT, LEANDER TYRONE

Sarasota, FL 34232

NIKOLOVA, SAVINA

Sarasota, FL 34240

WHEELER, BYRON

Sarasota, FL 34234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLYSON L SMITH, ESQ

Attorney at ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPT LEGAL DIVISION

1300 First Ave North

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendant Attorney

JORDAN L TAWIL, ESQ

17 Dr Mlk Jr St S Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NON REPORTING

09/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NON REPORTING

NOTICE OF FORFEITURE

09/22/2022: NOTICE OF FORFEITURE

COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS)

10/27/2022: COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS)

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FORFEITURE

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF FORFEITURE

CONTRABAND FORFEITURE BOND

10/27/2022: CONTRABAND FORFEITURE BOND

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/27/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/27/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/27/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/06/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/02/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/02/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/02/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 23; Party:; HUEWITT, LEANDER TYRONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 20; 11182022; Party:; WHEELER, BYRON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 21; 11182022; Party:; NIKOLOVA, SAVINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 22; 11182022; Party:; HUEWITT, LEANDER TYRONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Total Financial Assessment; 1,031.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,031.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2022-24383; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; (1,031.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Total Financial Assessment; 1,031.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,031.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1,031.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS); Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 11; AMENDED NOTICE OF SEIZURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 12; FORFEITURE AFFIDAVIT, DET. A. TALBOT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 18; Party:; WHEELER, BYRON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 3; PROPOSED ORDER RVCD BY COURT 10022022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION Doc # 4; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR EX-PARTE ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE RVCD BY COURT 10062022; Filed by:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION Doc # 5; FOR SEIZURE PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION (EX-PARTE) RCVD BY COURT 10062022; Filed by:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION Doc # 6; CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS RCVD BY COURT 10062022; Filed by:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketORDER Doc # 7; FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE SEIZURE (EX-PARTE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING Doc # 8; PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NON REPORTING; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORFEITURE; Doc # 2; AMENDED/NOTICE OF SEIZURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Allyson L, ESQ.