This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/28/2020 at 12:09:06 (UTC).

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT Vs. DEVIN F COLLINS

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against DEVIN F COLLINS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RONDOLINO, ANTHONY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendant

COLLINS, DEVIN F

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SASHA LOHN-McDERMOTT

Attorney at CITY OF ST PETERSBURG LEGAL DIVISION

1300 First Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

12/29/2015: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

FINAL JUDGMENT

12/29/2015: FINAL JUDGMENT

PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

12/22/2015: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

12/21/2015: DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/14/2015: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/19/2015: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/16/2015: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER TO ANSWER

11/16/2015: FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE-ORDER TO ANSWER

NOTICE OF FORFEITURE

11/12/2015: NOTICE OF FORFEITURE

EXHIBIT

11/12/2015: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE

11/12/2015: COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS)

NOTICE

10/26/2015: NOTICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/26/2015: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/29/2015: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT - NON SRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; OF FORFEITURE; Vol./Book 19035, Page 1023, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; COURT RCVD 122215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketPUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Party: COLLINS, DEVIN F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; DEFAULT ENTERED 12/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; DEVIN COLLINS 111715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-40917; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketFINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE-ORDER TO ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketEXHIBIT; A AFFD OF STRINGFELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketNOTICE; OF SEIZURE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SASHA LOHN-McDERMOTT