Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/19/2021 at 08:18:49 (UTC).

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA Vs. JANE BARNARD

Case Summary

On 01/18/2021 CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JANE BARNARD. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA

5800 South Corporate Place

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant

BARNARD, JANE

Saint Petersburg, FL 33704-1433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN LaVRAR, ESQ

Attorney at RAS LaVRAR LLC

1133 South University Drive Second Floor

Plantation, FL 33324-3303

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

01/21/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

F-J-Filing Notice-Out of State

01/21/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

CC JUDGMENT FROM COUNTY OF

01/21/2021: CC JUDGMENT FROM COUNTY OF

CC JUDGMENT FROM COUNTY OF

01/18/2021: CC JUDGMENT FROM COUNTY OF

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketRETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; Doc # 6; COPY NOTICE OF FILING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT FROM COUNTY OF; Doc # 3; RECORDED - HAMILTON COUNTY, INDIANA W/ ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 4; FOREIGN JUDGMENT WITH ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 384.45; Total Payments and Credits; 384.45; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-02287; CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA; (384.45)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 384.45; Total Payments and Credits; 384.45; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 384.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT FROM COUNTY OF; Doc # 2; HAMILTON OF THE STATE OF INDIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citibank South Dakota NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.