This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/04/2023 at 07:14:46 (UTC).

CITIBANK N A Vs. PHILIP WILSON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PHILIP WILSON. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N A

Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

WILSON, PHILIP

Clearwater, FL 33760-1945

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINIC M STERN

Attorney at DEBSKI & ASSOCIATES PA

Post Office Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant Attorney

DAVID C HICKS, ESQ

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP PA

1401 Manatee Avenue West Suite 1010

Bradenton, FL 34205

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/14/2022: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337530746

12/19/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; Party:; WILSON, PHILIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITIBANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-44870; CITIBANK N A; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITIBANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less