This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/22/2022 at 20:02:38 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER MILLER Vs. EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC CO RA

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 CHRISTOPHER MILLER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC CO RA. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AL FERRERA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/22/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/22/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - SERVED

02/16/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/01/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

03/17/2022: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE

02/22/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; Doc # 8; WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 7; OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 02022022 W/ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING; Party: EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MILLER, CHRISTOPHER; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-48687; MILLER, CHRISTOPHER; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MILLER, CHRISTOPHER; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less