This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/22/2021 at 20:04:17 (UTC).

CHRISTINE GIFFORD Vs. CARLOS SANCHEZ,et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 CHRISTINE GIFFORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARLOS SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIFFORD, CHRISTINE

Belleair Bluffs, FL 33770

Defendants

COLUMBIA SUSSEX CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS HILTON CLEARWATER BEACH RESORT AND SPA

740 Centre View Blvd.

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

SANCHEZ, CARLOS

Clearwater, FL 33767

COLUMBIA SUSSEX MANAGEMENT LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS HILTON CLEARWATER BEACH RESORT AND SPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEAN W KARIKAS, ESQ

3643 First Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorneys

J BOWEN BROWN, ESQ

Attorney at BELL LAW GROUP P A

407 N Howard Ave Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33606

BRADLEY S BELL, ESQ

Attorney at BELL LAW GROUP P A

407 N Howard Ave Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33606-1575

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

06/24/2021: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

COMPLAINT

06/24/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/24/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/24/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/01/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

JOINT STIPULATION

08/13/2021: JOINT STIPULATION

ACCEPTANCE

07/21/2021: ACCEPTANCE

AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/03/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

08/20/2021: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 11; ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT MOTION TO DISMISS; Party: COLUMBIA SUSSEX MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 9; OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Doc # 7; AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON BEHALF OF CARLOS SANCHEZ AND COLUMBIA SUSSEX MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: COLUMBIA SUSSEX CORPORATION; Party: SANCHEZ, CARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIFFORD, CHRISTINE; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-25193; GIFFORD, CHRISTINE; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GIFFORD, CHRISTINE; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: SANCHEZ, CARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: COLUMBIA SUSSEX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Columbia Sussex Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COLUMBIA SUSSEX MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLUMBIA SUSSEX CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN W KARIKAS