Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/13/2021 at 01:22:23 (UTC).

CHERYL FUSARI Vs. RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 CHERYL FUSARI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MINKOFF, THOMAS H and RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUSARI, CHERYL

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

VECTOR GROUP LTD INC

PHILLIP MORRIS USA INC

LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY

RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPNAY AS SUCCESSOR TO BROWN AND WILLIAMS USA INC

LIGGETT GROUP LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS LIGGETT AND MYERS TOBACCO COMPNAY FORMERLY KNOWN AS LIGGETT GROUP INC

RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

PHILLIP MORRIS INC

RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY

RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR TO BROWN AND WILLIAMS USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN S KALIL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN S KALIL P A

6817 Southpoint Pky Suite 1402

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

DANA GIBSON BRADFORD, II

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL AND RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

BONNIE C DABOLL

Attorney at JOHNSON DABOLL ANDERSON

2011 Cleveland Street Suite F

Tampa, FL 33606

KIMBERLY B COOK

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY AND BACON LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

EDWARD CARTER

325 John H Mcconnell Blvd Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43216

JOHN F YARBER

1420 Peachtree St Ne #800

Atlanta, GA 30309

TROY A FUHRMAN

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33601

ROBERT B PARRISH

Attorney at MOSELEY PRICHARD PARRISH KNIGHT AND JONES

501 W Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/14/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/13/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/13/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice320638756-398

01/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice320638756-324

01/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice320638756-299

01/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice320638756-298

01/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice320638756-288

01/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice320638756-212

01/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/20/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/20/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNEW SECTION ASSIGNMENT PER AO; Doc # 7; THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED TO SECTION 8, BUT WILL BE REASSIGNED TO SECTION 19 EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2021 PER AO 2020-022. MATTERS WILL CONTINUE TO BE HEARD BY THE SECTION 8 JUDGE UNTIL DECEMBER 31, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 6; Party: PHILLIP MORRIS USA INC; Party: RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 3; (SECOND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 4; (SECOND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketNOTICE; OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL / AMENDED EMAIL ADDRESS OF COUNSEL FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Party: RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032515 RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS DEF LORILLARD TOBACCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032515 RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS DEF RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032515 RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS DEF VECTOR GROUP LTD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032515 RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS DEF RJ REYNOLDS TABACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032715 RECEIPT FOR FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032715 UNOPPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032715 LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032715 CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032715 ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 032715 NOTICE OF HEARING OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILLIP MORRIS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VECTOR GROUP, LTD., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIGGETT GROUP, LLC is a litigant