Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/13/2021 at 16:35:00 (UTC).

CHAF PROPERTIES LLC Vs. JAMES PAYNE, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CHAF PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES PAYNE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAF PROPERTIES LLC

2675 50Th Ave N. #123

St Petersburg, FL 33714

CHAF PROPERTIES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

2675 50Th Ave N. #123

St Petersburg, FL 33714

Defendants

HUMPHREY, JEROME

Clearwater, FL 33760

PAYNE, JAMES

Clearwater, FL 33760

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW E SIEGEL

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 State Road 580 Suite 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice325242448-1130

11/20/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice325242448-1129

11/20/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice325242448-251

11/20/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/08/2021: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE

12/06/2019: NOTICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 8; PAYNE, JAMES / HUMPHREY, JEROME; Vol./Book 21383, Page 1033, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: HUMPHREY, JEROME; Party: PAYNE, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CHAF PROPERTIES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46038; CHAF PROPERTIES LLC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CHAF PROPERTIES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 3; OF NON RENEWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: PAYNE, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: HUMPHREY, JEROME

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAF PROPERTIES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD