Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2021 at 07:30:25 (UTC).

CHAD LOCKARD Vs. COOK INCORPORATED, et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 CHAD LOCKARD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MINKOFF, THOMAS H and RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOCKARD, CHAD

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

RAXWAL, VINOD, MD

Tampa, FL 33609

PATEL, PARAG, MD

Tampa, FL 33605

CHENG, WAYNE, MD

Tampa, FL 33605

COOK INCORPORATED AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Registered Agent Corporaton Service Company 135 North Pennsylvania Street Suite 1610

Indianapolis, IN 46204

COOK MEDICAL LLC AN INDIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Registered Agent Corporation Service Company 135 North Pennsylvania Street Suite 1610

Indianapolis, IN 46204

COASTAL CARDIOLOGY CONSULTANTS PA FLORIDA PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION DOING BUSINESS AS THE HEART AND VASCULAR INSTITUTE OF FLORIDA

C/O Gail F Moulds Esq 100 Second Ave S #902-S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED AN INDIANA CORPORATION

ACCESS HEALTHCARE PHYSICIANS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

14690 Spring Hill Drive Suite 101

Spring Hill, FL 34609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN R MAHER

Attorney at MAHER LAW FIRM PA

271 W Canton Ave Ste 1

Winter Park, FL 32789

MATTHEW S MOKWA

Attorney at THE MAHE LAW FIRM

271 W Canton Ave Ste 1

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

BRENDAN W ROWE

Attorney at JOSEPHER AND BATTEESE P A

500 N Westshore Blvd Ste 630

Tampa, FL 33609

CARISSA WHEELER BRUMBY

Attorney at BEYTIN MCCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

MINDY MCLAUGHLIN, ESQ

Attorney at BEYTIN MCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

CARISSA WHEELER BRUMBY, ESQ

Attorney at BEYTIN MCCLAUGHLIN MCLAUGHLIN

1706 E Eleventh Ave

Tampa, FL 33605

SHARON CARLSTEDT BRITTON, ESQ

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602-5311

ROBERT R HEARN, ESQ

101 East Kennedy Blvd Suite 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

RHETT C PARKER

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602-5311

RHETT C PARKER, ESQ

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

GAIL F MOULDS, ESQ

Attorney at DEACON MOULDS & STOFER

100 Second Ave S Ste 902S

St Petersburg, FL 33701-4337

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

08/14/2018: RESPONSE

RESPONSE

08/12/2018: RESPONSE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/25/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/25/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/16/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/12/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

01/17/2018: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/28/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

EXHIBIT

08/24/2018: EXHIBIT

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

08/07/2018: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

EMERGENCY MOTION

08/02/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION

RESPONSE

07/25/2018: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/27/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/25/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/13/2018: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

02/23/2018: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/28/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 136; PROPOSED AGREED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 137; PLTFS MTN TO STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 135; SECOND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNEW SECTION ASSIGNMENT PER AO; Doc # 134; THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED TO SECTION 8, BUT WILL BE REASSIGNED TO SECTION 19 EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2021 PER AO 2020-022. MATTERS WILL CONTINUE TO BE HEARD BY THE SECTION 8 JUDGE UNTIL DECEMBER 31, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 132; (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 131; TO STAY (RENEWED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 130; 031620 - 032020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 128; OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 129; OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: RAXWAL, VINOD, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: COOK INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: COOK MEDICAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LOCKARD, CHAD; Total Financial Assessment; 487.50; Total Payments and Credits; 487.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-31352; LOCKARD, CHAD; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LOCKARD, CHAD; Total Financial Assessment; 487.50; Total Payments and Credits; 487.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCESS HEALTH CARE PHYSICIANS is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENDAN W ROWE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEARN, ROBERT R