This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:03:24 (UTC).

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, et al Vs. COMMERCIAL FIRE AND COMMUNICATIONS INC

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against COMMERCIAL FIRE AND COMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

199 Water Street Suite 2100

New York, NY 10038-3526

HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE

INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

70 Seaview Avenue

Stamford, CT 06902-6040

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

99 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY

307 North Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

One Qbe Way

Sun Prairie, WI 53596

SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1832 Schuetz Road

St. Louis, MO 63146-3540

STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY

1299 Zurich Way

Schaumburg, IL 60196

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1900 L. Don Dodson Drive

Bedford, TX 76021

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO AMR-60396-03

Defendant

COMMERCIAL FIRE AND COMMUNICATIONS INC

16333 Bay Vista Drive

Clearwater, FL 33760

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH F RICH

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

PATRICIA I MURRAY

Attorney at BOYD RICHARDS PARKER & COLONNELLI, PL

100 Se Second St Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33131

REBECCA M CANSECO

Attorney at BOYD RICHARDS PARKER & COLONNELLI, PL

100 Se Second St Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

EXHIBIT

03/14/2022: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/23/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/23/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

SUMMONS - SERVED

04/06/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

04/11/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

04/14/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

INTERROGATORIES

04/25/2022: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

ORDER APPROVING

04/28/2022: ORDER APPROVING

AGREEMENT

04/28/2022: AGREEMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; Doc # 11; AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAGREEMENT; Doc # 12; ON CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Doc # 9; /REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10; /EXPERT REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 4/4/2022; Party: COMMERCIAL FIRE AND COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION/DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 5; Party: COMMERCIAL FIRE AND COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2022-06901; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: COMMERCIAL FIRE AND COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-09389; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A FLORIDA SURPLUS LINES NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Commercial Fire and Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant