Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/10/2021 at 22:22:54 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC Vs. JESUS CACERES

Case Summary

On 08/31/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JESUS CACERES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

P.O. Box 93477

Margate, FL 33093

Defendant

CACERES, JESUS

Pinellas Park, FL 33781-1931

Garnishee

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Maryellen Ella Ra 901 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERYL G HUNT

Attorney at HUNT & KAHN PA

P O Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093

Garnishee Attorney

THOMAS R FARRIOR, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES

03/09/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES

NOTICE

03/05/2020: NOTICE

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

02/11/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

JUDGMENT LIEN

12/12/2019: JUDGMENT LIEN

JUDGMENT LIEN

12/12/2019: JUDGMENT LIEN

ORDER

10/23/2019: ORDER

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

10/14/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/14/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

10/14/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING

10/14/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

10/14/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/14/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/23/2019: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/31/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

08/31/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

08/31/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/01/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 30; OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Doc # 29; HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES; Doc # 28; RETURNED SERVED HIUSIOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 27; MAILING 03052020 W/ATTACHED COPIESMTN/WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 25; HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 296.00; Total Payments and Credits; 296.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-04265; CAVALRY SPV I LLC; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 296.00; Total Payments and Credits; 296.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 24; HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD - SENT TO COURT 021320; Party: CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 296.00; Total Payments and Credits; 296.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-33226; CAVALRY SPV I LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 296.00; Total Payments and Credits; 296.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 6; Party: CACERES, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 8; Party: CACERES, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARRIOR , THOMAS RICHARD