This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/16/2022 at 16:18:47 (UTC).

CATALINA MARKETING CORPORATION Vs. QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 CATALINA MARKETING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATALINA MARKETING CORPORATION A/AN DELAWARE CORPORATION

200 Carillon Pkwy.

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendant

QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC A/AN DELAWARE CORPORATION

400 Logue Ave.

Mountain View, CA 94043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARD SOTO

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL & MANGES LLP

1395 Brickell Avenue Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

PRAVIN R PATEL

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL MANGES LLP

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

DAVID J LENDER

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL AND MANGES LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

ERIC HOCHSTADT

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL AND MANGES LLP

767 Fifth Ave

New York City, NY 10153

ROBERT DAHNKE

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL AND MANGES LLP

2001 M Street Nw Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

GREGORY A HEARING

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON P A

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700 P O Box 3324 (33601-3324)

Tampa, FL 33602

SAMUEL J MENDEZ

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL MANGES LLP

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

JOSHUA C WEBB

Attorney at HILL WARD & HENDERSON P A

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

QUYEN L TA

Attorney at KING AND SPALDING LLP

50 California Street Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROBERT M COOPER

Attorney at KING AND SPALDING LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Ave Nw 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20006

DENNIS P WAGGONER

Attorney at HILL WARD AND HENDERSON P A

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

MEGAN NISHIKAWA

Attorney at KING AND SPALDING LLP

50 California St Ste 3300

San Francisco, CA 94111

MICHAEL D ROTH

Attorney at KING AND SPALDING LLP

633 W Fifth St Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

12/17/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

ORDER GRANTING

12/03/2021: ORDER GRANTING

ORDER GRANTING

12/03/2021: ORDER GRANTING

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/29/2021: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/29/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/22/2021: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

11/22/2021: MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

11/19/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/13/2021: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 60; RESPONSE TO PLTF FIRST INTERROGATORY TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 57; UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 59; MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 56; (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 500.00; Total Payments and Credits; 500.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-28281; QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC; (100.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 500.00; Total Payments and Credits; 500.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Doc # 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 58; PROPOSED ORDER W/ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CATALINA MARKETING CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 710.00; Total Payments and Credits; 710.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 4; 02252021; Party: QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Party: CATALINA MARKETING CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9; AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: CATALINA MARKETING CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less