Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:06:48 (UTC).

CATALINA HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ Vs. ISAIR M MONTERO

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 CATALINA HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ISAIR M MONTERO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALLAN, LINDA R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-FD

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALLAN, LINDA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ, CATALINA

St Petersburg, FL 33714

Respondent

MONTERO, ISAIR M

Largo, FL 33773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ANGELICA D ROSELLO, ESQ

Attorney at CORTES HODZ FAMILY LAW AND MEDIATION PA

715 West Swann Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Doc # 16; BY THE CLERK / CONTESTED ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; Doc # 17; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK / CONTESTED ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT; Doc # 15; Party: HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ, CATALINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 12; Party: MONTERO, ISAIR M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCONTESTED ANSWER; Doc # 14; Party: MONTERO, ISAIR M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 11; 02272021; Party: MONTERO, ISAIR M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ, CATALINA; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-04425; HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ, CATALINA; (418.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ, CATALINA; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 1; Party: MONTERO, ISAIR M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 6; Party: HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ, CATALINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGELICA D ROSELLO, ESQ