This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/22/2023 at 12:08:07 (UTC).

CAROL MULVIHILL Vs. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 CAROL MULVIHILL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MULVIHILL, CAROL

Defendant

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH A KOPACZ, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

LINDSAY T BRIGMAN, ESQ

JULIA NAHHAS, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/27/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS - ISSUED

12/27/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/18/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/09/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/09/2023: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

01/18/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 9; COMPLAINT; Party:; PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 7; Party:; PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketPRIMARY JUDICIAL OFFICER CHANGE (UCR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISIONAL ASSIGNMENT CHANGE (UCR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MULVIHILL, CAROL; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-46049; MULVIHILL, CAROL; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MULVIHILL, CAROL; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party:; KOPACZ, JOSEPH A, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less