This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

CAROL JAZMIN ZAMORA Vs. ROBERT ANTHONY GUZMAN, JR

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAROL JAZMIN ZAMORA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERT ANTHONY GUZMAN, JR. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. ARNOLD, JACK R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-FD

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. ARNOLD, JACK R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN

Clearwater, FL 33755

Respondent

GUZMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY, JR

Clearwater, FL 33755

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 20; MOTION FOR TEMP SUPPORT/ PROPOSED ORDER UNSIGNED WITH COURT NOTES ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 19; ORDER FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN WITHOUT COPIES / NO ENV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 17; ORDER FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT & OTHER RELIEF WITH NO MINOR WITHOUT COPIES / NO ENV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN; Total Financial Assessment; 11.85; Total Payments and Credits; 11.85; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-00867; ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN; (0.90)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN; Total Financial Assessment; 11.85; Total Payments and Credits; 11.85; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 16; FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF; Filed by: ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 14; TO SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCONTESTED ANSWER; Doc # 15; Party: GUZMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 13; 120719; Party: GUZMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 10; Party: ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED; Doc # 11; Party: ZAMORA, CAROL JAZMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 12; FOR SERVICE; Party: GUZMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY, JR

    Read MoreRead Less