This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/15/2021 at 20:06:00 (UTC).

CARL EDWARD SANKEL, III Vs. BREANN ELIZABETH SANKEL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 CARL EDWARD SANKEL, III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BREANN ELIZABETH SANKEL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACK, ELIZABETH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-FD

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACK, ELIZABETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANKEL, CARL EDWARD, III

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Respondent

SANKEL, BREANN ELIZABETH

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILLICENT ATHANASON

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MILLICENT B ATHANASON PA

9020 Rancho Del Rio Dr Ste 101

New Port Richey, FL 34655

Respondent Attorney

CHRISTINE DIORIO, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTINE DIORIO

8517 Gunn Highway

Odessa, FL 33556

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RESPONDENT; Doc # 19; W/ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; SANKEL, BREANN ELIZABETH; Total Financial Assessment; 295.00; Total Payments and Credits; 295.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-18243; SANKEL, BREANN ELIZABETH; (295.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; SANKEL, BREANN ELIZABETH; Total Financial Assessment; 295.00; Total Payments and Credits; 295.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO COUNTERPETITION; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DIVORCE A CHILD'S VIEW; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 16; Party: SANKEL, BREANN ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION; Doc # 17; Party: SANKEL, BREANN ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 12; 6/26/21 W /ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING; Party: SANKEL, CARL EDWARD, III

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; SANKEL, CARL EDWARD, III; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 7; NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 8; FOR COURT PROVIDED OR FOR PRIVATE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - PARENTING CLASS; Doc # 9; Party: SANKEL, CARL EDWARD, III

    Read MoreRead Less