This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 20:14:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE NA Vs. GLEN R ASHLEY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 CAPITAL ONE NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GLEN R ASHLEY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

ASHLEY, GLEN R

Oldsmar, FL 34677-2546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMIRO GUSTAVO KRUSS

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

KEVIN SPINOZZA, ESQ

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN PA

806 South Douglas Rd Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

01/14/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/14/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331939148

01/19/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

ORDER APPROVING (R)

03/23/2022: ORDER APPROVING (R)

STIPULATION

03/18/2022: STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketORDER APPROVING (R); Doc # 11; (AGREED) STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Vol./Book 21991, Page 1150, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 10; FOR SETTLEMENT AND FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 01212022; Party: ASHLEY, GLEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01695; CAPITAL ONE NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 6; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUSS, RAMIRO GUSTAVO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin