Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:41:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. WILLIAM HOUGH

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM HOUGH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

806 Douglas Road South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

HOUGH, WILLIAM

Dunedin, FL 34698-9519

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA, ESQ

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN PA

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice325414235-477

12/04/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice325414235-53

12/04/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322247574-880

04/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322247574-391

04/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

06/02/2020: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/26/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/21/2021: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/17/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ATTACHMENT

10/03/2019: ATTACHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

10/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

09/13/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

EXHIBIT

09/13/2019: EXHIBIT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/13/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 18; HOUGH, WILLIAM; Vol./Book 21359, Page 2211, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 16; SERVE PROCESS/120 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 15; SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 13; TO SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 10; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Party: HOUGH, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34818; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin