This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 20:13:53 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. STEPHANIE N GORDON

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHANIE N GORDON. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

GORDON, STEPHANIE N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMIRO GUSTAVO KRUSS

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

KEVIN SPINOZZA, ESQ

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN PA

806 South Douglas Rd Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

01/14/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/14/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331938505

01/19/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

01/27/2022: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR

03/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom332768489

03/07/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

03/28/2022: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 10; Party: GORDON, STEPHANIE N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2022-05301; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR; Doc # 8; Party: GORDON, STEPHANIE N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: GORDON, STEPHANIE N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01693; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUSS, RAMIRO GUSTAVO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin