This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/20/2021 at 06:12:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. SHANNON B WEST

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHANNON B WEST. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Po Box 44718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

WEST, SHANNON B

Saint Petersburg, FL 33713-8808

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAUDIA R EIKNER, ESQ

Attorney at DEBSKI & ASSOCIATES PA

Post Office Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330440266

10/12/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

10/06/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

COMPLAINT

10/06/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-38692; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eikner, Claudia R