This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/20/2021 at 06:12:49 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. KRISTINA LOE

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KRISTINA LOE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Po Box 44718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

LOE, KRISTINA

Tarpon Spgs, FL 34689

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAUDIA R EIKNER, ESQ

Attorney at DEBSKI & ASSOCIATES PA

Post Office Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330393775

10/11/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

10/06/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

COMPLAINT

10/06/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

10/06/2021: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-38696; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 2; CUSTOMER AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eikner, Claudia R