Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:30:59 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. KATHLEEN A ABBARNO

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KATHLEEN A ABBARNO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

806 Douglas Road South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

ABBARNO, KATHLEEN A

Clearwater, FL 33756-2458

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA, ESQ

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

COPY

01/23/2020: COPY

COPY

12/09/2019: COPY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/05/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COPY

03/10/2020: COPY

SMALL CLAIMS RESET NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

12/10/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/23/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

09/13/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

EXHIBIT

09/13/2019: EXHIBIT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/13/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 19; BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 18; BANKRUPTCY COURT PLEADING-NOTICE OF DEADLINE TO FILE PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 17; ELECTRONIC BANKRUPTCY NOTICING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 16; WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 13; PLTF - EMAILED; Party: SPINOZZA, KEVIN, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 14; - REG MAIL; Party: ABBARNO, KATHLEEN A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 9; Party: ABBARNO, KATHLEEN A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34800; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin