Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:37:34 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. EMILY SYKES

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EMILY SYKES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

806 Douglas Road South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

SYKES, EMILY

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-5052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA, ESQ

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

01/08/2020: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

COPY

01/08/2020: COPY

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/27/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

09/13/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

EXHIBIT

09/13/2019: EXHIBIT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/13/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 15; AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT; Doc # 17; (FINAL) $1568.31 PRIN $235. COSTS; Vol./Book 20841, Page 2616, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 13; NON-MILITARY, WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 11; AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 10; Party: SYKES, EMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 7; Party: SYKES, EMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 9; Party: SYKES, EMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34807; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin