This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 20:10:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. DAVID E NEWEY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID E NEWEY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

NEWEY, DAVID E

Largo, FL 33771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIRO GUSTAVO KRUSS

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN PA

806 Douglas Road Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

01/14/2022: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

MOTION

03/10/2022: MOTION

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

02/09/2022: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

CERTIFICATE

02/09/2022: CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

02/09/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 13; FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND/OBJECT TO DEFT S DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 8; TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Doc # 9; OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 01212022; Party: NEWEY, DAVID E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: NEWEY, DAVID E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01698; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUSS, RAMIRO GUSTAVO