Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:29:26 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA Vs. CRISTINA P ARELLANO

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRISTINA P ARELLANO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

806 Douglas Road South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

ARELLANO, CRISTINA P

Largo, FL 33770-1038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN SPINOZZA, ESQ

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN P A

806 Douglas Rd South Tower Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

GARY G CARPENTER, ESQ

Attorney at GARY G CARPENTER P L

1901 Ulmerton Rd Ste 435

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322247572-484

04/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322247572-389

04/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

06/05/2020: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

STIPULATION

10/09/2019: STIPULATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/23/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/20/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

09/13/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

EXHIBIT

09/13/2019: EXHIBIT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/13/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 15; ARELLANO, CRISTINA P; Vol./Book 21031, Page 1657, 11 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 13; FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; Party: ARELLANO, CRISTINA P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 7; Party: ARELLANO, CRISTINA P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 9; Party: ARELLANO, CRISTINA P; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34816; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin