This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 03/17/2022 at 20:27:12 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC Vs. AMY HENDERSON

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMY HENDERSON. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

HENDERSON, AMY

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAROLYN KARETTIS, ESQ

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

CAROLYN KARETTIS

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

12/17/2021: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

12/17/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

EXHIBIT

12/17/2021: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

12/17/2021: EXHIBIT

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331575075

12/22/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/29/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 12232021; Party: HENDERSON, AMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-48142; BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; A BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 6; B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karettis, Carolyn