This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

BRITTANY CELESTE GIPSON Vs. CHRISTOPHER L GIPSON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BRITTANY CELESTE GIPSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER L GIPSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LOAR, DONEENE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-FD

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LOAR, DONEENE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Respondent

GIPSON, CHRISTOPHER L

Saint Augustine, FL 32086

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REX GOLDEN, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF REX GOLDEN

780 - 94Th Ave N Ste 111

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; Doc # 17; ORDER TO ATTEND DIVORCE: A CHILD'S VIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DIVORCE A CHILD'S VIEW; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 14; 121019 W/ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING; Party: GIPSON, CHRISTOPHER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 13; Party: GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE; Total Financial Assessment; 22.20; Total Payments and Credits; 22.20; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20130; GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE; (22.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE; Total Financial Assessment; 22.20; Total Payments and Credits; 22.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 11.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE; Total Financial Assessment; 22.20; Total Payments and Credits; 22.20; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 407.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE; Total Financial Assessment; 22.20; Total Payments and Credits; 22.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERT COMPLIANCE WITH FL FAM STAT 12.285; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 9; TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP AUTHORIZATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 10; Party: GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED; Doc # 12; Party: GIPSON, BRITTANY CELESTE

    Read MoreRead Less