This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 12:16:06 (UTC).

BRIAN SCOTT Vs. GERARDO JACOB ARAUJO, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 BRIAN SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GERARDO JACOB ARAUJO. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT, BRIAN

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendants

ARAUJO, GERARDO JACOB

Riverview, FL 33579

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A SAMARTIN, ESQ

Attorney at BERMAN LAW GROUP

800 N Belcher Road

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendant Attorneys

PAMELA C PAPASOV, ESQ

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE PA

4301 West Boy Scout Boulevard Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

HEATHER L STOVER, ESQ

Attorney at OGDEN & SULLIVAN P A

5422 Bay Center Dr Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609-3420

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

04/07/2022: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/07/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/07/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

04/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 10; Party: UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 6; Party: ARAUJO, GERARDO JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 7; TO THE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 8; TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9; TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; Party: ARAUJO, GERARDO JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SCOTT, BRIAN; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-09275; SCOTT, BRIAN; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SCOTT, BRIAN; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: ARAUJO, GERARDO JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMARTIN , ROBERT ANTHONY