This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 20:14:02 (UTC).

BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY Vs. SALVADOR DOGI LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALVADOR DOGI LLC. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY A/AN FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

C/O Englander Fischer 721 First Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

SALVADOR DOGI LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BEAUTIFY THE BEAST

C/O Massey Law Group Pa 76 4Th Street #262

St Petersburg, FL 33731

Not Yet Classified

JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALEXANDRA M DRAGOVICH, ESQ

Attorney at ENGLANDER AND FISCHER LLP

721 First Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

SHAWNA PERAU

Attorney at HIGHTOWER STRATTON NOVIGROD KANTOR

330 Clematis St Ste 201

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorneys

STARLETT M MASSEY, ESQ

Attorney at MASSEY LAW GROUP P A

P O Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731-0262

FRANK DELLORUSSO, ESQ

Attorney at SOUTH FLORIDA LAW PLLC

1920 E Hallandale Beach Blvd Ste 701

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

STARLETT M MASSEY

Post Office Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731

Other Attorneys

EDWARD O SAVITZ, ESQ

Attorney at BUSH ROSS P A

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601-3913

 

Court Documents

MOTION

03/30/2022: MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

03/30/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

RESPONSE

02/27/2022: RESPONSE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

02/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

02/27/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS ON COUNTERCLAIM ISSUED

01/25/2022: COUNTER CLAIM SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 50; TO ABATE,COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH 558 AND MOTION FOR TIME EXTENSION; Filed by: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 46; 02242022; Party: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 47; IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 44; Party: BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 45; Party: BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 10.00; Total Payments and Credits; 10.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2022-01983; BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOYD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 10.00; Total Payments and Credits; 10.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCOUNTER CLAIM SUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 43; Party: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 12; FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 7; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Doc # 6; OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A BREAKDOWN OF PROPOSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B CONTRACT CHANGE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; C DEMAND FOR PAYMENT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SALVADOR DOGI LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BEAUTIFY THE BEAST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAVITZ , EDWARD OWEN