This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 11:25:23 (UTC).

BOSTON FINANCE GROUP LLC Vs. JOHN YANCHUNIS

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 BOSTON FINANCE GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN YANCHUNIS. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSTON FINANCE GROUP LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

4912 Creekside Dr

Clearwater, FL 33760

Defendant

YANCHUNIS, JOHN

Tampa, FL 33602

Garnishees

SUNTRUST BANK

Suntrust Bank C/O Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALLYSON L LAZZARA

4912 Creekside Dr

Clearwater, FL 33760

V STEPHEN COHEN

Attorney at BAJO COHEN AGLIANO PA

606 East Madison Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

JOHN A YANCHUNIS

201 N Franklin St 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

Garnishee Attorneys

JOHN A BARRY

7455 Chancellor Dr

Orlando, FL 32809

RONALD L STEPHENSON

Po Box 180

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317214542-566

07/12/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317214542-569

07/12/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317214542-568

07/12/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317214542-567

07/12/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317214542-565

07/12/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/06/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

03/20/2015: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

01/08/2016: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

12/21/2015: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326468247-2283

02/12/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326468247-2062

02/12/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326468247-1497

02/12/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326468247-1614

02/12/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326468247-107

02/12/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326015538-1726

01/15/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326015538-1275

01/15/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326015538-1274

01/15/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice326015538-564

01/15/2021: DISMISSAL NOTICE

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MEYER, KEITH); CASE DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MEYER, KEITH); DATA ENTRY ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 8; WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 6; (COUNT II NOT ADDRESSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOSTON FINANCE GROUP LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 662.00; Total Payments and Credits; 662.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-21379; BOSTON FINANCE GROUP LLC; (18.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOSTON FINANCE GROUP LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 662.00; Total Payments and Credits; 662.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (R); Doc # 5; Vol./Book 20663, Page 662, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; AMENDMENT TO SECURED PROMISSORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; ATTORNEY INSTRUCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; SECURED PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; SECURITY AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; ATTORNEY INSTRUCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; LETTER REGARDING NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; LETTER REGARDING SECURITY AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 3/20/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less