This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/07/2019 at 08:02:39 (UTC).

BOLEY CENTERS INC Vs. NARJIS IGBUHAY, et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 BOLEY CENTERS INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NARJIS IGBUHAY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CO

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOLEY CENTERS INC

C/O John E. Mcmillan 5309 E. Busch Blvd.

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

BOLEY CENTERS INC DOING BUSINESS AS BURLINGTON GARDENS APARTMENTS

C/O John E. Mcmillan 5309 E. Busch Blvd.

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

Defendants

VILAYSACK, JONATHAN

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

IGBUHAY, NARJIS

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E McMILLAN

Attorney at JOHN E McMILLAN PA

5309 East Busch Blvd

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

04/01/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

ORDER

03/11/2019: ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/05/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

03/04/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

03/04/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/20/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/20/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

02/20/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

02/20/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

02/20/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER OF

02/21/2019: ANSWER OF

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

LEASE

02/06/2019: LEASE

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

02/06/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

02/06/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 24; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 23; IN FAVOR OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • ORDER; Doc # 21; PERMITTING ATTORNEY TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING BY TELEPHONE 032619 10:45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 19; TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 20; 032619 10:45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 17; FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • ANSWER OF; Doc # 16; Party: IGBUHAY, NARJIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9; 02112019; Party: IGBUHAY, NARJIS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 8; Party: IGBUHAY, NARJIS; Party: VILAYSACK, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 1; ISSUED; Party: VILAYSACK, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: IGBUHAY, NARJIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 5; SEVEN DAY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 6; TEN DAY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • LEASE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; BOLEY CENTERS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-05344; BOLEY CENTERS INC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; BOLEY CENTERS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less