This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/10/2021 at 14:47:57 (UTC).

BLANCA L REVILLA vs. HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES, et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2011 BLANCA L REVILLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MINKOFF, THOMAS H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVILLA, BLANCA L

Defendants

AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGMENT LLC

360 Central Avenue Apt # 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES

360 Central Avenue Apt # 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

HOWE, DEBRA

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

KANNON HEALTH MANAGMENT LLC

360 Central Avenue Apt # 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGMENT GULF COAST LLC

4730 Acorn Circle

Sarasoat, FL 34233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARL R WILANDER

Attorney at MENDES REINS & WILANDER PLLC

800

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorney

CORY L CHANDLER

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON ROSEN VINCI

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/13/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AMENDED

11/12/2015: AMENDED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

04/30/2014: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

04/23/2014: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

EXHIBIT

04/09/2014: EXHIBIT

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

03/27/2014: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

EXHIBIT

03/25/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

03/25/2014: EXHIBIT

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/03/2014: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE

11/22/2013: CERTIFICATE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/09/2013: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/09/2013: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

09/03/2013: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

08/20/2013: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

08/19/2013: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

07/29/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/11/2012: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/29/2011: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

199 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 032916

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; WITH PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 19149, Page 98, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE / PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; (EXPERT WITNESS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; (EXPERT WITNESS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketUNIFORM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES; TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
211 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketSummons - Fee Paid $; Comment: SUMMONS FEE PAID $50.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 008 BY 2594 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less