Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 23:22:31 (UTC).

BIAGIO ILLIANO Vs. STEFANIE ALOCCI

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 BIAGIO ILLIANO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEFANIE ALOCCI. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLLACK, FREDERICK L. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-FD

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLLACK, FREDERICK L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ILLIANO, BIAGIO

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Respondent

ALOCCI, STEFANIE

Xxxxxx, FL 00000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TYRONE ZDRAVKO, ESQ

Attorney at REESER & ZDRAVKO LLC

3411 Palm Harbor Blvd Ste A

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketUNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 12; w/ ,MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ATTACHED; Vol./Book 20763, Page 1796, 12 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 10; Party: ILLIANO, BIAGIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 11; 110619 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketANSWER OF; Doc # 7; /ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE/WAIVER OF NOTICES; Party: ALOCCI, STEFANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 9; MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ILLIANO, BIAGIO; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-37007; ILLIANO, BIAGIO; (418.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; ILLIANO, BIAGIO; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: ALOCCI, STEFANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYRONE ZDRAVKO, ESQ