This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/18/2020 at 22:22:41 (UTC).

BENJAMIN K STIERHOFF Vs. CONMED CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/05/2020 BENJAMIN K STIERHOFF filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CONMED CORPORATION. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K

Defendant

CONMED CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER JAMES SABA

Attorney at WENZEL FENTON CABASSA P A

1110 North Florida Avenue Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/05/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

04/05/2020: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/05/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

04/05/2020: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/05/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/05/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/05/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/01/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

EXHIBIT

05/26/2020: EXHIBIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (SRS); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 11; NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 12; COPY NOTICE OF REMOBAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 9; 05062020; Party: CONMED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-10348; STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 8; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-13571; STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STIERHOFF, BENJAMIN K; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: CONMED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conmed, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABA , CHRISTOPHER JAMES