Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 13:23:11 (UTC).

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC Vs. FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC

31119 Us Hwy 19 N, Ste 2

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS CASTLE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

31119 Us Hwy 19 N, Ste 2

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Defendants

FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

903 Nw 65Th Street, Suite 200

Boca Raton, FL 33487

FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

903 Nw 65Th Street, Suite 200

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEFFREY C MARTY

Attorney at BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC

31119 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 2

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

MITCHELL L FRALEY, ESQ

Attorney at BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC

29399 U S Hwy 19 N Ste 350

Clearwater, FL 33761

JEFFREY C MARTY, ESQ

Attorney at BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC

29399 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 350

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendant Attorneys

JENNIFER L VELAZCO, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

JOSE E BOSCH, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF

07/24/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

06/22/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

06/15/2020: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/02/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/02/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

09/11/2019: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE

01/18/2021: NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/13/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/13/2019: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/18/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/18/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

06/18/2019: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/18/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 17; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 10; Party: FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 7; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-22920; BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENCHMARK CONSULTING, INC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Peninsula Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELAZCO, JENNIFER L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bosch, Jose E