Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 11:55:09 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC Vs. TAMARA BETHUNE

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAMARA BETHUNE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

BETHUNE, TAMARA

Saint Petersburg, FL 33704

Garnishee

SOUTHERN HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

SARAH JORDAN, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE AND ASSOCIATS PA

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

02/02/2021: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/04/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

SUBPOENA

04/02/2020: SUBPOENA

FINAL JUDGMENT

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

COPY

12/19/2019: COPY

AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT

12/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/11/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

10/08/2019: STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

10/01/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-03026; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 19; SOUTHERN HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC; Party: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Doc # 16; (NON-SERVED) OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSUBPOENA; Doc # 15; DUCES TECUM (SIGNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 12; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 14; $1746.56 PRIN $251.48 COSTS; Vol./Book 20827, Page 2042, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: BETHUNE, TAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: BETHUNE, TAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 5; Party: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Party: BETHUNE, TAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34775; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R