This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 09/04/2021 at 08:08:21 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC Vs. LUCAS SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUCAS SMITH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave.

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

SMITH, LUCAS

Clearwater,, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING (R)

07/26/2021: ORDER APPROVING (R)

SUMMONS - SERVED

07/22/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

07/23/2021: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/06/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

07/06/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; SMITH, LUCAS; Total Financial Assessment; 0.30; Total Payments and Credits; 0.30; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-18686; SMITH, LUCAS; (0.30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; SMITH, LUCAS; Total Financial Assessment; 0.30; Total Payments and Credits; 0.30; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 7; RE: SIGNED AGREEMENT AS RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING (R); Doc # 6; SETTLEMENT STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL; Vol./Book 21646, Page 1214, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 4; 07192021; Party: SMITH, LUCAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-26576; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: SMITH, LUCAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R