Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:50:14 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC Vs. LAKESHA BAXTER

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAKESHA BAXTER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

BAXTER, LAKESHA

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES P A

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

01/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/29/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/17/2019: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/09/2019: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT

02/11/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/01/2019: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 15; $1250. PRIN $51.48 COSTS LESS PAYMENTS MADE $80. Vol./Book 20881, Page 702, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 12; BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 13; OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO); Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketORDER APPROVING (R); Doc # 10; SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL; Vol./Book 20822, Page 1323, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: BAXTER, LAKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: BAXTER, LAKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 5; Party: BAXTER, LAKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34774; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R