This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/02/2023 at 07:08:26 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG Vs. KRIENA SMITH

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KRIENA SMITH. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

SMITH, KRIENA

Seminole, FL 33772

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

01/12/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/12/2023: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

01/18/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337922171

01/16/2023: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 4; 01172023; Party:; SMITH, KRIENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2023-01266; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (185.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less