Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:45:52 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC Vs. GENEVIEVE HENRY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GENEVIEVE HENRY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

HENRY, GENEVIEVE

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES P A

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

04/21/2020: AFFIDAVIT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

04/21/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

02/04/2020: STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

12/17/2019: RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED

SMALL CLAIMS RESET NOTICE

12/17/2019: RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED

FINAL JUDGMENT

05/04/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT

SMALL CLAIMS RESET NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

12/10/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

10/01/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 20; $4450.08 PRIN $380.85 COSTS LESS PAYMENTS MADE $2307.08; Vol./Book 20992, Page 69, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 17; BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 18; OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 12; PLTF - EMAILED; Party: LOTANE, TROY R, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 13; - REG MAIL; Party: HENRY, GENEVIEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE; Doc # 8; 12/10/2019 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: HENRY, GENEVIEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: HENRY, GENEVIEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 5; Party: HENRY, GENEVIEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34762; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R