Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 11:55:28 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG Vs. BRITTANIE COTTON

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRITTANIE COTTON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

COTTON, BRITTANIE

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES P A

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324555969-414

10/09/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324555969-413

10/09/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

ORDER GRANTING

10/27/2020: ORDER GRANTING

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

10/26/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

ALIAS NOTICE - RETURNED NOT SERVED

04/07/2020: ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS ALIAS NOTICE

03/02/2020: ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT ALIAS NOTICE

03/02/2020: ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT

REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

02/28/2020: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/01/2019: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/13/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 16; WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 14; PLTF MOTION FOR GOOD CAUSE AND EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE- 120 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 13; FOR GOOD CAUSE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH); COURT CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 11; Party: COTTON, BRITTANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-06147; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: COTTON, BRITTANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: COTTON, BRITTANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 5; Party: COTTON, BRITTANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34661; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R