Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/08/2021 at 07:11:13 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG Vs. ADAM SECHREST

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADAM SECHREST. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

SECHREST, ADAM

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom327120954

03/23/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

03/18/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

03/18/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-10837; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R