This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/25/2021 at 06:17:22 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG Vs. PHILIP GIRARDI

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PHILIP GIRARDI. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

GIRARDI, PHILIP

Saint Petersburg, FL 33706

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

10/21/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330463472

10/14/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

10/11/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/11/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/11/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 4; 10192021; Party: GIRARDI, PHILIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-39244; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DBA BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R