This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/12/2021 at 07:11:55 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG Vs. LASHONTI LOVE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LASHONTI LOVE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

LOVE, LASHONTI

Saint Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/06/2021: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330143932

09/24/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

09/21/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

09/21/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 4; W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-36505; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DBA BAYFRONT HEALT; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R