Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/19/2021 at 06:00:47 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG Vs. KEYWANA TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEYWANA TAYLOR. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

TAYLOR, KEYWANA

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom327393565

04/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

04/05/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

04/05/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-13328; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R