This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/05/2023 at 20:10:26 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG, C O LOTANE AND ASSOCIATES PA Vs. TERMAINE BURTON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC , DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG, C O LOTANE AND ASSOCIATES PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TERMAINE BURTON. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG C O LOTANE AND ASSOCIATES PA

Defendant

BURTON, TERMAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/05/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/05/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

12/05/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/13/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337354198

12/07/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 4; 12132022; Party:; BURTON, TERMAINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-43580; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; BY DC NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less