This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 07/06/2022 at 20:05:26 (UTC).

BARCLEY ESTATES CONDO NO 2 ASSOCIATION INC Vs. BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 BARCLEY ESTATES CONDO NO 2 ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CO

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLEY ESTATES CONDO NO 2 ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

8821 Martin Luther King St North

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Defendants

BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC

11380 Prosperity Farms Road Unit 221E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

COLONIAL PACIFIC LEASING CORPORATION

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

FIA CARD SERVICES NA

1100 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19884

LASALLE NATIONAL LEASING CORPORATION

555 California Street 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94101

RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD D A ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN, MOHAMMED ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN, MOHAMMED A ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN, MOHAMMED ADNAN ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN, MOHAMMED D ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN, MOHAMMED D ADNAN ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN, MOHAMMED DA ALSO KNOWN AS RAHMAN,

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

RING POWER CORPORATION

500 World Commerce Pkwy

St. Augustine, FL 32092

SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

STEARNS BANK NA AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST STATE BANK AS SUCCESSOR TO FIRST STATE BANK BY ASSET ACQUISTION FROM THE FDIC

4191 Second Street South

Saint Cloud, MN 56303

SYNOVUS BANK AS SUCCESSOR TO BY MERGER TO COLUMBUS BANK AND TRUST COMPANY A GEORGIA BANKING CORPORATION

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOHAMMAD D A RAHMAN

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OR OTHER PARTIES IN PSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

WELLS FARGO EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WHITNEY NATIONAL BANK

228 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70161

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAREN E MALLER, ESQ

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE et al LLP

490 First Avenue South Suite 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/13/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

TO BE ISSUED - PROCESS

06/16/2022: CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED

NOTICE OF DROPPING

05/31/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING

CLERK DEFAULT-ENTERED

05/31/2022: CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

05/31/2022: MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

05/26/2022: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/26/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/25/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/25/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

DISCLAIMER

05/04/2022: DISCLAIMER

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT; Doc # 30; Party: BARCLEY ESTATES CONDO NO 2 ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED; Doc # 31; 6/20/2022; Party: RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD D A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT; Doc # 27; Party: BARCLEY ESTATES CONDO NO 2 ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED; Doc # 28; Party: BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING; Doc # 29; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOHAMMAD D A RAHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 25; 05/20/2022; Party: RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD D A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 26; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOHAMMAD D A RAHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 23; 05/12/2022; Party: BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 24; 04/13/2022; Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDISCLAIMER; Doc # 22; OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 9; Party: RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD D A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 10; Party: RING POWER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 11; Party: SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 12; Party: STEARNS BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 13; Party: SYNOVUS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 14; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOHAMMAD D A RAHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 15; 60 DAY; Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 16; Party: WELLS FARGO EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 17; Party: WHITNEY NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 18; Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OR OTHER PARTIES IN PSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL PACIFIC LEASING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITNEY NATIONAL BANK AS SUCCESSOR TO SIGNATURE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Equipment Finance Inc is a litigant