This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:31:06 (UTC).

BARBARA SIEGLER Vs. ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC,et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 BARBARA SIEGLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIEGLER, BARBARA

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Defendants

AQUATIC TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC

C/O David Maynard., As Registered Agent 812 Harbor Island

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC

C/O Allen Bobo, As Registered Agent

ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC

C/O Mark Rivlin, Esq., As Registered Agent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH A KOPACZ, ESQ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PAL HARBOR PA

35686 Us Highway 19 N

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant Attorneys

JASON R HULL, ESQ

Attorney at WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD P A

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602-5309

BRADLEY P HAWKINS, ESQ

Attorney at WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD P A

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

11/14/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/14/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

11/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/11/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

12/20/2022: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2022: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/19/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/19/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 24; (NOTICE OF SERVING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 16; Party:; CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 18; Party:; CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC; Party:; ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party:; AQUATIC TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party:; CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party:; ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7; AS TO AQUATIC TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 8; AS TO CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 9; AS TO ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 10; AS TO ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 11; AS TO AQUATIC TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 12; AS TO CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISLAND IN THE SUN MHP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-AM PROPERTIES INC DOING BUSINESS AS ISLAND IN THE SUN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH A KOPACZ